This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:11:42 (UTC).

STERLING JEWELERS-V-PERAZA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 STERLING JEWELERS-V-PERAZA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1749

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERLING JEWELERS,INC.

Defendant

ALEJANDRO F PERAZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0018 $25.00; 170202-0018-CK Reference Number 0721546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $34.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 4095.61 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170201-0695 $25.00; 170201-0695-CK Reference Number 0721545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/16; JUDGMENT FOR: STERLING JEWELERS,INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALEJANDRO F PERAZA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,107.84 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $466.17 COSTS $462.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,036.51; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 160719-0381 $5.00; 160719-0381-MC Reference Number 023-0264020998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ALEJANDRO F PERAZA WITH COSTS OF $78.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2738 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less