This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:11:19 (UTC).

STERLING JEWELERS-V-JONATHAN CLICK

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 STERLING JEWELERS-V-JONATHAN CLICK was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1746

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERLING JEWELERS,INC.

Defendant

JONATHAN CLICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170831-0558 $25.00; 170831-0558-CK Reference Number 0755444

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 6599.04 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170830-0808 $25.00; 170830-0808-CK Reference Number CK-0755445

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $318.06)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. ORDERED ENTERED 02/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: STERLING JEWELERS,INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JONATHAN CLICK; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,141.07 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $771.16 COSTS $343.75 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,255.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS AND IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JONATHAN CLICK.; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. SET ASIDE.; DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. ORDERED SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FOR DECLARATION AND ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 161116-0674 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JONATHAN CLICK SERVED ON 03/04/16 WITH FEES OF $78.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2551 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF STERLING JEWELERS,INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less