This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 22:37:36 (UTC).

STERLING CASUALTY -V- FLORES

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 STERLING CASUALTY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9297

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRED M CHARNESS

21818 Craggy View Street Suite 202

Chatsworth, CA 91311

DE LA FLOR &ASSOCIATES

1901 E 4Th St . Ste 300

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LAW OFFICE OF LEIGH E CHARNESS

21818 Craggy View St Suite 202

Chatsworth, CA 91311

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $340.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $517.02)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $340.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $517.02)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FOR FREDERICO DIAZ FLORES. BAIL SET AT $5000.00. MAY NOT FORFEIT.

BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FOR FREDERICO DIAZ FLORES. BAIL SET AT $5000.00. MAY NOT FORFEIT.

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: B/W ISSUED

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: B/W ISSUED; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; JUDGMENT DEBTOR FAILS TO APPEAR FOR DEBTOR'S EXAM;BENCH WARRANT IS ORDERED ISSUED FOR FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000.00 -- BAIL MAY NOT BE FORFEITED.; BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED UPON RECEIPT OF SIGNED AFFIDAVIT AND PROCESSING FEE MADE PAYABLE TO THE APPROPRIATE SERVING AGENCY.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:17; ACTION - COMPLETE

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Continued

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ANGEL COLEMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES PRESENT; VIRGINIA DIAZ AS INTERPRETER FOR DEFENDANT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; DEFENDANT FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; DEFENDANT ORDERED TO BRING SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS TO THE NEXT HEARING DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; 09:36; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ARRAIGNMENT ON BENCH WARRANT; Disposition: Continued

ARRAIGNMENT ON BENCH WARRANT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; DEFENDANT FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:21; ARRAIGNMENT HELD; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MARIA GREILACH # 300832 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR FEDERICO DIAZ. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT ORDERS:; BENCH WARRANT QUASHED BEFORE ISSUANCE.; ORAP DEBTOR EXAM IS SET BY THE COURT.; FEDERICO DIAZ IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; OTHER ORDERS: DEBTOR IS INFORMED TO BRING HIS OWN SPANISH INTERPRETER AT THE NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SET FOR/CONTINUED TO 02/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:23; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE W/SUBPOENA OF DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/03/17 AS TO FREDERICO DIAZ FLORES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE W/SUBPOENA OF DOCS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/03/17 AS TO FREDERICO DIAZ FLORES, FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170824-0156 $60.00; 170824-0156-CK Reference Number 17418

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/05/16.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/05/16.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FOR RCIRS099539 (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FOR RCIRS099539 (IMAGED)

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FOR 100.00 COSTS/1703.00 CREDIT/1613.67 INTEREST.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FOR 100.00 COSTS/1703.00 CREDIT/1613.67 INTEREST.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/26/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY HAVE &; RECOVER FROM FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,880.01 INTEREST $1,613.67 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,523.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $340.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $517.02)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $170.00) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • ORIGINAL CIVIL BENCH WARRANT RECALL SENT T SHERIFFS CENTRAL CIVIL OFFICE VIA INTEROFFICE MAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • ORIGINAL SIGNED BENCH WARRANT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES WITH COSTS OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • BENCH WARRANT UNSERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • BENCH WARRANT RECALLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • ISSUED BENCH WARRANT, $50 + INSTRUCTIONS SENT TO S HERIFF COURT SERVICES INTEROFFICE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FOR FREDERICO DIAZ FLORES. BAIL SET AT $5000.00. MAY NOT FORFEIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • PLAINTIFF STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • ON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 11/07/2016 OF STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ATTORNEY FRED M CHARNESS ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • ON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 11/07/2016 OF STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICE OF LEIGHE CHARNESS ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FOR RCIRS099539 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY FOR RENEWAL; Minutes; Receipt: 161115-0279 $30.00; 161115-0279-CK Reference Number 16317

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FOR 100.00 COSTS/1703.00 CREDIT/1613.67 INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 06/26/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY HAVE &; RECOVER FROM FEDERICO DIAZ FLORES:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,880.01 INTEREST $1,613.67 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,523.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.