This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 05:36:13 (UTC).

STEPHEN HAMILTON -V- CARRIE LASSABE-CROW ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2010 STEPHEN HAMILTON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARRIE LASSABE-CROW. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN HAMILTON

Defendants

JEREMY C CROW

CARRIE LASSABE-CROW

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/07/2011

DocketMONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/08/2010 OF STEPHEN HAMILTON GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: STEPHEN HAMILTON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARRIE LASSABE-CROW, JEREMY C CROW; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $505.00 AND DAMAGES $1,860.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,965.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketDECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2011

DocketDEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2010

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2010

DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2010

DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 25.00 ); Minutes; Receipt: 101014-2234 $25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2010

DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2010

DocketCLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF STEPHEN HAMILTON ORDERED ENTERED 10/14/10; JUDGMENT FOR: STEPHEN HAMILTON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARRIE LASSABE-CROW, JEREMY C CROW, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CARRIE LASSABE-CROW, JEREMY C CROW, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2010

DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY PURSUANT TO CCP 1169 FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/22/2010

DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST (DENIED) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2010

DocketFAXED TO NEEDLES THE DENIED APP TO POST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFAXED APP & ORDER TO POST TO BARSTOW COURT FOR REVIEW/SIGNATURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2010

DocketFILING FEE PAID BY STEPHEN HAMILTON FOR APP & ORDER TO POST; Minutes; Receipt: 100921-2951 $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2010

DocketDECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE (CROW) FILED BY STEPHEN HAMILTON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2010

DocketDECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE (LASSABE-CROW) FILED BY STEPHEN HAMILTON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2010

DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BY POSTING RECEIVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2010

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2010

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2010

DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100909-4832 $235.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less