This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 14:31:20 (UTC).

STEPHANIE WANG-V-TRENT SCHMIDT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 STEPHANIE WANG-V-TRENT SCHMIDT was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2392

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

STEPHANIE WANG

Defendants and Appellants

TRENT SCHMIDT

ROXANNE M SCHMIDT

Defendants and Respondents

ROXANNE M SCHMIDT

STEPHANIE WANG

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

RICKY W. POON

2926 West Valley Blvd

Alhambra, CA 91803

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR FILED.

REMITTITUR FILED.

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION FILED.

ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR TIMELY DESIGNATE THE RECORD ON APPEAL. FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR TIMELY DESIGNATE THE RECORD ON APPEAL. FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISIFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISIFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

NOTICE OF APPEAL ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF STEPHANIE WANG FILED BY TRENT SCHMIDT

NOTICE OF APPEAL ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF STEPHANIE WANG FILED BY TRENT SCHMIDT

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

DECLARATION RE: RICKY POON IN SUPPORT OF PLNTF CLAIM FILED BY STEPHANIE WANG

DECLARATION RE: RICKY POON IN SUPPORT OF PLNTF CLAIM FILED BY STEPHANIE WANG

DECLARATION RE: PEARL POON IN SUPPORT OF PLNTF CLAIM FILED BY STEPHANIE WANG

DECLARATION RE: PEARL POON IN SUPPORT OF PLNTF CLAIM FILED BY STEPHANIE WANG

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JDGMT/STAY WRIT; Disposition: GRANTED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JDGMT/STAY WRIT; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:43; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICKY W POON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT TRENT SCHMIDT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; TRENT SCHMIDT'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMT/STAY WRIT IS HEARD.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY RICKY W POON.; WITNESS -- TRENT SCHMIDT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; TRENT SCHMIDT'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMT/STAY WRIT IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF STEPHANIE WANG.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF STEPHANIE WANG AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TRENT SCHMIDT.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO TRENT SCHMIDT; DEFENDANT TRENT SCHMIDT TO FILE ANSWER AND SERVE PLAINTIFF.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE TO SHERIFF.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF STEPHANIE WANG IS SET FOR 11/09/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

EX PARTE RE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JDGMT/STAY WRIT FILED BY TRENT SCHMIDT

EX PARTE RE: MTN TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & DEFAULT JDGMT/STAY WRIT FILED BY TRENT SCHMIDT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SERVING 4U BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SERVING 4U BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 171023-0410 $25.00; 171023-0410-CK Reference Number 1697

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 10/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 10/03/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ROXANNE M SCHMIDT; POSTED ON 10/03/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ROXANNE M SCHMIDT; POSTED ON 10/03/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0207 $255.00; 170927-0207-CK Reference Number 1695

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • JUDGMENT DISMISSING APPEAL IS AFFIRMED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • REMITTITUR ROUTED TO BARSTOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • APPEAL FILED 11/30/2017 OF TRENT SCHMIDT IS DISMISSED PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION TO REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PRIOR TO CERTIFICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR TIMELY DESIGNATE THE RECORD ON APPEAL. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISIFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • APPEAL PACKET SENT TO APPELLATE DESK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AND SENT TO PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • REJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS FORM IS FOR PARTIES WHO ARE NOT ON THE CASE P LEASE SEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171003-0421 $20.00; 171003-0421-CK Reference Number 1696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,260.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0207 $255.00; 170927-0207-CK Reference Number 1695

    Read MoreRead Less