This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/12/2018 at 21:08:19 (UTC).

STEISKAL -V- ISN GLOBAL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2011 STEISKAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ISN GLOBAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2252

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC

Appellant

ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC.

Defendant

ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC

Respondent

ROBERT J STIESKAL DC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

HERBOLD, CARL F

1330 Via Zurita

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $20.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $20.00. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110927-1948 $30.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2012
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • EXHIBITS FOR DEFT DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 11:00; VIA TELECOM WITH COUNSEL FOR THE APPEALANT THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; APPEAL FROM HIGHER COURT IS DISMISSED. ORIGINAL JUDGMENT STANDS; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL BEFORE HEARING (CIV); DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC., ON 03/16/12; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC FOR APPEAL; Minutes; Receipt: 111230-2800 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 111230-0965 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2011 OF ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC FILED BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC.(SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/11

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2011
  • CASE PLACED IN THE UD CALENDAR WALL FOR 12/9 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC REPRESENTED BY RIBERT SSTEISKAL.; ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC REPRESENTED BY EDGAR REED.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DEFENDANT WILL NOT STIPULATE TO THE HEARING OFFICER; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: VENUE CHALLENGE OR COURT TRIAL SET FOR 12/09/11 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F9.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY ROBERT I STEISKAL DC, INC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/09/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $20.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC FOR RQST FOR COURT ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 111110-2786 $20.00; 111110-2786-CK Reference Number 1002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY ISN GLOBAL ENTERPRISES, INC. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110927-1948 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less