This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 18:42:12 (UTC).

STEFANIE JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 STEFANIE JOHNSON was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0341

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE

RICHARD FALZONE

SANDY TURNER

Conservatee

STEFANIE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MURTAGH, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

177 E. Colorado Blvd Ste 200

Pasadena, CA 91105

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 02/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF ORDR REESTABLISHING SNT BY ELECTRONIC ON 11/27/17 AS TO SANDY TURNER, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF ORDR REESTABLISHING SNT BY ELECTRONIC ON 11/27/17 AS TO SANDY TURNER, FILED.

REPORT BY GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STEPANIE JOHNSON FILED

REPORT BY GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STEPANIE JOHNSON FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

HRG OF 10/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/17/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/17/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/25/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/25/17 FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHRISTOPHER JAMES MURTAGH WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RICHARD FALZONE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHRISTOPHER JAMES MURTAGH WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RICHARD FALZONE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHRISTOPHER JAMES MURTAGH WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHRISTOPHER JAMES MURTAGH WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE.

PETITION FOR ORDER TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FILED BY LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE AND RICHARD FALZONE(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR ORDER TO ESTABLISH SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST FILED BY LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE AND RICHARD FALZONE(PROBATE).

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RECORD FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO THE RECORD FILED. (IMAGED)

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

COPY OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF CONSERVATOR EDUCATION COURSE OF LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE PLACED IN FILE. (IMAGED)

VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT FILED.

VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT FILED.

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON FILED. (IMAGED)

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON FILED. (IMAGED)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SANDY TURNER ARE WAIVED FOR 1 CC ORDER RE PAYMENT OF ATTY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON PETITION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM ETC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES TO COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL ETC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER PRESENT FOR STEFANIE JOHNSON.; ATTORNEY JASON OEI (LIMITED SCOPE) PRESENT FOR PETITIONERS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROBATE NOTES ARE CLEARED ON THE RECORD; COURT GRANTS PETITION FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES TO COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COURT RESETS THE DATE OF ACCOUNTING FROM JUNE 25, 2018 TO HAVE BOTH ACCOUNTING DATES (FOR; CONSERVATORSHIP OF ESTATE AND TRUST) TO BE HEARD ON DECEMBER 10, 2018.; SANDY TURNER IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR STEFANIE JOHNSON.; HEARINGS:; VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; HEARING DATE OF 12/10/18 CONFIRMED.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/01/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF ORDR ESTABLISHING TRUST BY MAIL ON 12/05/17 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF COPY OF ORDR REESTABLISHING SNT BY ELECTRONIC ON 11/27/17 AS TO SANDY TURNER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • PROBATE INVESTIGATORS' REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CI RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICHARD FALZONE, LOIS JOHNSON FALZONE FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 161118-0718 $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.