This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:31:28 (UTC).

STEADFAST-V-NORTHSTAR FIRE

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 STEADFAST-V-NORTHSTAR FIRE was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1519

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUDOLPH & SLETTEN,INC

STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAUSEN MILLER P.C.

17901 Von Karman Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS OUTSIDE CA NOTICE/ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECIEPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS OUTSIDE CA NOTICE/ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECIEPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC. FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY.

NOTICE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE IS RETURNED; BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORIGINAL CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT MUST BE ATTACHED FOR; PARTIES SERVED OUTSIDE OF CALIFORNIA.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER OSC RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER DEFAULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER DEFAULT); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAY HARKER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY, RUDOLPH & SLETTEN,INC.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: CORRECT INTEREST AND RESUBMIT PROPOSED JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER OSC RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER DEFAULT) SET FOR 10/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGE REJECTS FOR EXCESSIVE INTEREST PURSUANT TO C ALCULATION WORKSHEET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DECLARATION OF JAY D HARKER IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED COURT JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; THE COURT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S):; PER JUDICIAL REVIEW, COUNSEL NEEDS TO FILE A DECLARATION EXPLAINING THE INTEREST CALCULATIONS; AND AMOUNTS. THIS DECLARATION SHOULD BE SUBMITTED WHEN RE-SUBMITTING THE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DECLARATION OF JAY D HARKER ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW THOMPSON ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON NORTHSTAR FIRE PROTECTION, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAY HARKER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY, RUDOLPH & SLETTEN,INC.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: WILL FILE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (AFTER DEFAULT) SET FOR 08/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE/REQ. FOR DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEEDS PAGE TWO OF PROOF WITH SIGNATURES IN ORDER TO FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY, RUDOLPH & SLETTEN,INC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEADFAST INSURANCECOMPANY FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0965 $435.00; 171030-0965-CK Reference Number 24659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less