This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:43:11 (UTC).

STATE OF CA EDD -V- ANDREWS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2001 STATE OF CA EDD filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against ANDREWS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5973

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2001

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME

Defendant

MARCUS ANDREWS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2005

DocketAction Text: FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 051007-0498 $100.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2004

DocketAction Text: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2002

DocketAction Text: WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2002

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( * )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2002

DocketAction Text: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2001

DocketAction Text: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2001

DocketAction Text: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2001

DocketAction Text: STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2001

DocketAction Text: COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON PETITION FILED 03/26/2001 OF STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME ORDERED ENTERED 03/26/01; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCUS ANDREWS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2971.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,971.32; CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less