This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 14:53:12 (UTC).

STATE FARM -V- GONZALEZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 STATE FARM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1690

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendants

EVERARDO PARRA

DIANA L CABRERA GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON LEGAL APC

6345 Balboa Boulevard Building 3 Suite 365

Encino, CA 91316

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO EVERARDO PARRA SERVED ON 03/17/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0475 $240.00; 170131-0475-CK Reference Number CK 4111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.