This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:03:25 (UTC).

STATE FARM-V- DEFINA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 STATE FARM-V- DEFINA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1353

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

Defendants

ANGEL DEFINA

RICARDO GARCIA

DELFINA ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON LEGAL, APC

6345 Balboa Boulevard Building 3, Suite 365

Encino, CA 91316

Defendant Attorney

ABELTIN & MIGOYA, LLP

250 N. Golden Circle Drive Suite 115

Santa Ana, CA 92705-4023

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RICARDO GARCIA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RICARDO GARCIA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANGEL DEFINA SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANGEL DEFINA SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

ANSWER FILED BY RICARDO GARCIA, DELFINA ANGEL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ABELTIN & MIGOYA, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY RICARDO GARCIA, DELFINA ANGEL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ABELTIN & MIGOYA, LLP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINA CICIONE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP.; ATTORNEY MARCY PETTITT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:27; TRIAL REQUESTED.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING:; [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY PAGE NUMBERED, TABBED AND; INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C) (F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98; DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN COMPLIANCE WITH THAT; STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS, EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR; WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP IS SET FOR 01/02/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:29; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP, ANGEL DEFINA REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DEFENDANT RICARDO GARCIA, DELFINA ANGEL FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY RICARDO GARCIA, DELFINA ANGEL FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171220-0789 $480.00; 171220-0789-CK Reference Number #3589941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY RICARDO GARCIA, DELFINA ANGEL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ABELTIN & MIGOYA, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP, DELFINA ANGEL IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RICARDO GARCIA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANGEL DEFINA SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0511 $240.00; 171030-0511-CK Reference Number 6087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less