This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/13/2018 at 11:36:08 (UTC).

STATE FARM -V- CARMELA ETHRIDGE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/24/2010 STATE FARM filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CARMELA ETHRIDGE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0728

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

Defendant

CARMELA LYNN ETHRIDGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SCOTT R KAMRATH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/27/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2011

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2011

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KIRTLAND L MAHLUM, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: APRIL MARCUM; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; BAILIFF: J HALTERMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVE LEVY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CARMELA LYNN ETHRIDGE; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE SERVICE COMPLETION.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/27/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.; APPEARANCE IS MANDATORY UNLESS PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED 5 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2011

DECLARATION RE: OF DILIGENCE FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 11/24/2010 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2010

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101129-0556 $240.00; 101129-0556-CK Reference Number 33574

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2010

CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less