This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:03:16 (UTC).

STATE FARM-V-CABANILLA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 STATE FARM-V-CABANILLA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1352

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

Defendants

MARIA CABANILLA

WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON LEGAL, APC

6345 Balboa Boulevard Building 3, Suite 365

Encino, CA 91316

Defendant Attorneys

PARKER STRAUS, LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

STRAUS MEYERS LLP

225 Broadway Suite 1550

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARIA CABANILLA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MARIA CABANILLA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

ANSWER FILED BY WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA, MARIA CABANILLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PARKER STRAUS, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA, MARIA CABANILLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PARKER STRAUS, LLP.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF PARKER STRAUS, LLP FOR MARIA CABANILLA CHANGES ITS NAME TO STRAUS MEYERS LLP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • ONLY ONE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED HAD TO ENTER TWICE FOR 2 DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WILEHADO TACATA CABANILLA SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0490 $380.00; 171030-0490-CK Reference Number 6071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/30/2017 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less