This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 16:26:23 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL -V- MURPHY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2016 STATE FARM MUTUAL filed an Other lawsuit against MURPHY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7189

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE

Defendant

TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ORDERED ENTERED 05/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $46,986.95 INTEREST $47,927.88 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $94,914.83; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ORDER ON RFA RE SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ALLOWED PER COURT FILED

ORDER ON RFA RE SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ALLOWED PER COURT FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE AS TO DOES ONLY

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/16/16 WITH COSTS OF $64.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/16/16 WITH COSTS OF $64.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE ORDERED ENTERED 05/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $46,986.95 INTEREST $47,927.88 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $94,914.83; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON RFA RE SUBMISSION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ALLOWED PER COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR 07/25/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE SUMMARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/13/2016 OF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE AS TO TRACY ANDREWS MURPHY.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • PLAINTIFF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161013-0819 $435.00; 161013-0819-CK Reference Number CK 23453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT/DECL OF VENUE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST INDICATE WHERE INCIDENT HAPPENED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.