This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:03:58 (UTC).

STAR ZESK N MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 STAR ZESK N MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8582

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STAR ZESK

Respondent

MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF STAR ZESK FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF STAR ZESK ORDERED ENTERED 02/01/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STAR ZESK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: FL-170 STATES THAT BOTH PARTIES HAVE FILED AN; INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, BUT NONE HAVE BEEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STAR ZESK FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF STAR ZESK AS TO MICHAEL WAYNE ZESK JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT FWSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR FILING FEE PAID BY STAR ZESK IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0938 $435.00; 171025-0938-VS Reference Number 031-0054453441

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STAR ZESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF STAR ZESK IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less