This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:12:22 (UTC).

STANLEY JOSEPH DYDO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 STANLEY JOSEPH DYDO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1078

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KENNETH W. DYDO

Decedent

STANLEY JOSEPH DYDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THE ELDER & DISABILITY LAW FIRM, APC

104 E. Olive Avenue Suite 103

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 05/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY KENNETH W. DYDO.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY KENNETH W. DYDO.

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION OF KENNETH W DYDO FILED

DECLARATION OF KENNETH W DYDO FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 022018 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 022018 FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KENNETH W. DYDO FOR CERTIFIED COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180522-0093 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON OEI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT REVIEWS A COPY OF THE CORPORATION GRANT DEED WHICH IS THE VESTING DOCUMENT IN THIS CASE.; PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 10/30/2017 OF KENNETH DYDO IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 10/30/2017 OF KENNETH DYDO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • VACATE PRDET HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY KENNETH W. DYDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROP. RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON OEI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO OPEN AN ESTATE FOR POST-DECEASED SPOUSE AND TO; NOTIFY LEINHOLDERS, IF ANY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KENNETH W DYDO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 022018 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PET. TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0568 $465.00; 171030-0568-CK Reference Number 5083

    Read MoreRead Less