This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/04/2018 at 16:34:59 (UTC).

STACY MORALES-N-JUSTIN MORALES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 STACY MORALES-N-JUSTIN MORALES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0809

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STACY MORALES

Respondent

JUSTIN GILBERT MORALES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/01/2016 OF STACY MORALES FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/01/2016 OF STACY MORALES ORDERED ENTERED 02/24/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JUSTIN GILBERT MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE ARE STILL CORRECTIONS TO BE MADE AS MARKED IN RED..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; YOUR FORMS ARE BEING RETURNED TO YOU BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOUR FORMS ARE; INCOMPLETE. PLEASE SEE RED MARKS FOR COMPLETION. PLEASE ADDRESS SPOUSAL SUPPORT FOR BOTH PARTIES; TO THE CASE ON FL-180 #4(L). PLEASE SEE FL-170 #7(B). THANKYOU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUSTIN GILBERT MORALES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/01/2016 OF STACY MORALES AS TO JUSTIN GILBERT MORALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF STACY MORALES IS DEN.; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • COURT ALLOWS STACY MORALES TO MAKE PAYMENTS ON FEES OF $435.00 BEGINNING ON 03/09/16 IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY STACY MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY STACY MORALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S49

    Read MoreRead Less