This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 09:38:13 (UTC).

SSI AND ASSOCIATES -V- WILSON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SSI AND ASSOCIATES -V- WILSON was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5515

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SSI AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

JESSICA WILSON

MATTHEW WILSON

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0583 $100.00; 170711-0583-CK Reference Number 6175

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAM FILED AS TO JESSICA WILSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAM FILED AS TO JESSICA WILSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; COMMISSIONER GUY A BOVEE, PRESIDING; CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SSI AND ASSOCIATES REPRESENTED BY SHANNON ULLOA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MATTHEW WILSON, JESSICA WILSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:43; COURT NOTES THAT THE PROOF OF SERVICES THAT HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED ARE FOR THE SAME DEFENDANT.; DEFENDANT JESSICA WILSON HAS NOT BEEN SERVED.; SHANNON ULLOA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MATTHEW WILSON HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; ON COURTS,'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT JESSICA WILSON WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MATTHEW WILSON.; JUDGMENT FOR: SSI AND ASSOCIATES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MATTHEW WILSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $140.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,640.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAM FILED AS TO JESSICA WILSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MATTHEW WILSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0583 $100.00; 170711-0583-CK Reference Number 6175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less