This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 09:38:29 (UTC).

SSI AND ASSOCIATES -V- ALTAMIRANO

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SSI AND ASSOCIATES -V- ALTAMIRANO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5516

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SSI AND ASSOCIATES

Defendant

VICTOR ALTAMIRANO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR ALTAMIRANO. PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR ALTAMIRANO. PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0598 $100.00; 170711-0598-CK Reference Number 6175

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; COMMISSIONER GUY A BOVEE, PRESIDING; CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SSI AND ASSOCIATES REPRESENTED BY SHANNON ULLOA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR ALTAMIRANO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:48; SHANNON ULLOA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; COURT REDUCES THE CLAIM AMOUNT TO $2500 AS THE PLAINTIFF HAS REACHED ITS MAXIMUM NUMBER OF; CASES ABLED TO BE FILED FOR OVER $2500.00.; NO OBJECTION BY PLAINTIFF.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VICTOR ALTAMIRANO.; JUDGMENT FOR: SSI AND ASSOCIATES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR ALTAMIRANO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,595.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VICTOR ALTAMIRANO. PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0598 $100.00; 170711-0598-CK Reference Number 6175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less