This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 02:03:55 (UTC).

SPSSM VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 SPSSM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5466

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP

Defendants

CARLOS ENRIQUE GARCIA

CEWNA TORRES

ROSALIA GARCIA

GARCIA, CARLOS ENRIQUE

GARCIA, ROSALIA

TORRES, CEWNA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at H.G. Long & Associates

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE- LOST OF ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY SP

01/15/2020: DECLARATION RE- LOST OF ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY SP

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED. 585 DE

01/15/2020: MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED. 585 DE

DECLARATION RE- REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER C

01/09/2020: DECLARATION RE- REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER C

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDG

01/09/2020: DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDG

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

12/04/2019: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

10/29/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNT

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

10/24/2019: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

10/24/2019: CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED. JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

10/24/2019: APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMIS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

10/24/2019: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO CEWNA TORRES SERVED ON

10/24/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO CEWNA TORRES SERVED ON

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROSALIA GARCIA SERVED O

10/24/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROSALIA GARCIA SERVED O

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CARL

10/24/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CARL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS

10/24/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/18/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

09/18/2019: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT -$10,000 FILED. SUMMON

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2020
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer - Case Open

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Court Default Judgment - After Possession (585) LLT; Comment; Comment: (9/18/2019 - 0001 - UDLUD Complaint <$10,000); Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP; Awarded Against; TORRES, CEWNA; GARCIA, ROSALIA; GARCIA, CARLOS ENRIQUE; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,795.00; Holdover Damages: $3,139.29; Attorney Fees: $400.00; Costs: $725.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $6,059.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: LOST OF ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMoney Judgment After 585 Declaration Filed; Comment: MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED. 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP GRANTED BY COURT. JUDGMENT FOR: SPSSM INVESTMENTS LP JUDGMENT AGAINST: CARLOS ENRIQUE GARCIA, ROSALIA GARCIA, CEWNA TORRES JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,795.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $725.00 AND DAMAGES $3,139.29. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6059.29 SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed; Comment: DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Previously Entered, Reqst for Court Judgmt Under CCP; Comment: DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLevying Officer Ntc of Writ of Possession Filed. Costs of:; Comment: LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191029-0223; ConversionPayment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE 000100, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDefault Packet Received; Comment: DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190918-0896; ConversionPayment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $280.00; Total Payments and Credits: $280.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Daily Rental Value Filed-Daily Rental Value; Comment: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $49.83.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPast Due Rent is:; Comment: PAST DUE RENT IS $1,795.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint of <$10,000 Filed; Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. 190918-0896-CK CUE/ 255.00 PAYMT 190918-0896-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1215411

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where SPSSM Investments, Inc. is a litigant