This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 10:55:23 (UTC).

SPRINGLEAF-V-ODONNELL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 SPRINGLEAF-V-ODONNELL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4554

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES,INC.

Defendant

BRIAN ODONNELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

I ROBERT STEINGISSER

8331 Utica Ave Suite 130

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • VACATE OSCD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110506-2648 $240.00; 110506-2648-CK Reference Number 220702643

    Read MoreRead Less