This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 06:38:06 (UTC).

SPRING STREET -V- MILLON

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 SPRING STREET filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MILLON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0208

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP

Defendant

MICHAEL MILLON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S SCHONFELD

801 E Chapman Ave Suite 214

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION ONLY)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION ONLY); Minutes; Receipt: 150218-1905 $25.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/23/2015 OF SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP ORDERED ENTERED 02/18/15; JUDGMENT FOR: SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MICHAEL MILLON; POSTED ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MICHAEL MILLON; POSTED ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150123-1321 $255.00; 150123-1321-CK Reference Number 50848

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2015
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION ONLY); Minutes; Receipt: 150218-1905 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • ORGNL WRIT WALKED TO SCS BIN AT THE END OF THE DAY ******* .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/23/2015 OF SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP ORDERED ENTERED 02/18/15; JUDGMENT FOR: SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/23/2015 OF SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP AS TO MICHAEL MILLON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON MICHAEL MILLON; POSTED ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/23/2015 OF SPRING STREET ASSOCIATES LP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/28/15 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150128-1466 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $820.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $27.33.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150123-1321 $255.00; 150123-1321-CK Reference Number 50848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.