This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:09:41 (UTC).

SPIRIT-V-SB GAS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2017 SPIRIT-V-SB GAS was filed as a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0682

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC

Defendant

SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED SMITH, LLP

355 Grand Ave Suite 2900

Losa Angeles, CA 90071-3659

Defendant Attorney

LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, YOU & BRILL LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0283 $435.00; 170127-0283-CK Reference Number 112693

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, YOU & BRILL LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, YOU & BRILL LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0538 $240.00; 170206-0538-VS Reference Number 025-0066513356

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/30/17

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 03:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 03:00 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

AMENDED ANSWER ON UD COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED 01/27/2017 OF SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC FILED BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC..

AMENDED ANSWER ON UD COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED 01/27/2017 OF SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC FILED BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC..

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 03:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 03:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINE NEWHARTH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:26; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; COURT TO ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT ON 03/10/17, UNLESS PLAINTIFF SUBMITS A DECLARATION TO ENTER; JUDGMENT AT A LATER DATE OR FILE A DISMISSAL ON OR BEFORE 03/09/17.; 08:29; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $82,738.65 INTEREST $1,042.73 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $24,554.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $108,336.18; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC.

NOTICE OF APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCOST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $739.30 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO CA C- STORES, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPROVAL OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUD RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $82,738.65 INTEREST $1,042.73 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $24,554.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $108,336.18; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 03:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTINE NEWHARTH PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:26; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; COURT TO ENTER STIPULATED JUDGMENT ON 03/10/17, UNLESS PLAINTIFF SUBMITS A DECLARATION TO ENTER; JUDGMENT AT A LATER DATE OR FILE A DISMISSAL ON OR BEFORE 03/09/17.; 08:29; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC. FOR STIP AND ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 170301-0655 $20.00; 170301-0655-CK Reference Number 113492

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC..; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-1075 $150.00; 170221-1075-VS Reference Number 031-0007366448

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC. FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-1069 $7.00; 170221-1069-VS Reference Number 031-0007366327

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY SERVED ON 01/30/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUM/COMPL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE FILE WITH FONTANA COURT UD DIVISION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC. FOR ADDITIONAL FILING FEE FOR ANSWER; Minutes; Receipt: 170209-0536 $195.00; 170209-0536-VS Reference Number 025-0066791742

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY SB GAS AND WASH MANAGEMENT, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, YOU & BRILL LLP.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0538 $240.00; 170206-0538-VS Reference Number 025-0066513356

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170127-0283 $435.00; 170127-0283-CK Reference Number 112693

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketPAST DUE RENT IS $82,738.65

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $533.80.--BEGINNING ON 01/22/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIRIT SPE PORTFOLIO 2006-4, LLC is a litigant