This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 22:37:55 (UTC).

SORENSEN -V- SORENSEN

Case Summary

On 01/14/2013 SORENSEN filed an Other lawsuit against SORENSEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTEN S SORENSEN

Defendant

SHERRIE M SORENSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. ALAN PLOTT

57365 Twentynine Palms Hwy Suite A

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF J ALAN PLOTT, APC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF J ALAN PLOTT, APC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/14/2013 OF CHRISTEN SORENSEN FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/14/2013 OF CHRISTEN SORENSEN FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF COURT JUDGMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF COURT JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; COURT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING: (1) PLEAS SUBMIT A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF; COURT JUDGMENT (2) PARTIES MUST BE NAMED EXACTLY AS THEY; APPEAR ON COMPLAINT (3) INTEREST ON STATEMENT OF DAMAGES DOES NOT; MATCH THE JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF DEFAULT PACKET FOR PROVE UP HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF DEFAULT PACKET FOR PROVE UP HEARING SENT.; Minutes; DEFAULT PACKET HAS BEEN REJECTED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:; JUDGMENT NEEDS TO BE ON PLEADING OR ON THE JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM, NOT BOTH.; CLERK CANNOT ACCEPT CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNLESS THERE IS AN ORDER BY THE COURT TO DO SO. THIS IS; IN RE: SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; PLAINTIFF CAN SEEK AN ORDER OR CAN BRING THE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS ON THE DAY OF THE; HEARING NO SELF-ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE WAS PROVIDED.; REJECTED DOCUMENTS WILL BE PLACED IN CLERKS OFFICE UNDER THE LETTER "P" FOR PICK UP; NOTICES PRINTED

PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS FILED.

PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS FILED.

DECLARATION OF ALAN J PLOTT IN SUPPORT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED

DECLARATION OF ALAN J PLOTT IN SUPPORT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHERRIE M SORENSEN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHERRIE M SORENSEN FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MAIL ON 07/18/13 AS TO SHERRIE M. SORENSEN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MAIL ON 07/18/13 AS TO SHERRIE M. SORENSEN, FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHERRIE M SORENSEN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/20/13

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHERRIE M SORENSEN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/20/13

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 130114-2986 $435.00; 130114-2986-CK Reference Number 5499

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • PARTY CHRISTEN S SORENSEN UPDATED: CONTACT INFO. PRO PER STATUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF J ALAN PLOTT, APC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHRISTEN S SORENSEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 150914-1743 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 141201-3775 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/14/2013 OF CHRISTEN SORENSEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY J. ALAN PLOTT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF CHRISTEN S SORENSEN PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP.; THE COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED ALL SUBMITTED DOCUMENTS.; CHRISTEN S SORENSEN'S MOTION JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/14/2013 OF CHRISTEN SORENSEN ORDERED ENTERED 09/09/14; JUDGMENT FOR: CHRISTEN S SORENSEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHERRIE M SORENSEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $969,872.00 INTEREST $203,673.12 ATTORNEY FEES $9,143.75 COSTS $467.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,183,155.87; JUDGMENT ENTERED; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT NON-SUIT GRANTED AFTER TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT NONSUIT GRANTED AFTER TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY J ALAN PLOTT (ON 8/28/14) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; HEARING ON: OSC RE DISMISSAL HELD; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: CLIENT UNAVAILABLE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/09/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY J ALAN PLOTT (ON 8/28/14) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; HEARING ON: DEFAULT PROVE UP HELD; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: CLIENT UNAVAILABLE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/09/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23A.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SHERRIE M SORENSEN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 130114-2986 $435.00; 130114-2986-CK Reference Number 5499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.