This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:36:27 (UTC).

SOLIS -V- VERMEER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SOLIS -V- VERMEER was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9533

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRACY SOLIS

JULIO ESTRADA

ALMA SOLIS

Defendants

RANDALL VANHEYNINGEN

VERMEER TRANSPORT INC

C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FERNANDO D VARGAS

8647 Haven Avenue Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorney

HOSP, GILBERT & BERGSTEN

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 410

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON 12/15/17 AS TO EAA PACIFIC, INC., FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON 12/15/17 AS TO EAA PACIFIC, INC., FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

AMENDED ANSWER ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ALMA SOLIS FILED BY C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC.

AMENDED ANSWER ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ALMA SOLIS FILED BY C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ANSWER FILED BY C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOSP, GILBERT & BERGSTEN.

ANSWER FILED BY C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOSP, GILBERT & BERGSTEN.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RANDALL VANHEYNINGEN SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RANDALL VANHEYNINGEN SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF APP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON 12/15/17 AS TO EAA PACIFIC, INC., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 171122-0816 $4.71; 171122-0816-VS Reference Number 033-0042565942

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED ANSWER ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ALMA SOLIS FILED BY C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DEFENDANT C. VERMEER TRANSPORT INC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTY MUST BE SERVED EXACTLY AS SUED SEE ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALMA SOLIS, TRACY SOLIS, JULIO ESTRADA FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0003 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less