This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 04:49:10 (UTC).

SOL SEREJO -V- HOWELL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2010 SOL SEREJO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOWELL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0109

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Claimants

BIRGITTE SEREJO

LINE KONDRUP ELKJAER

PHILIP MAR SEREJO

JONATHAN SOL SEREJO

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BIRGITTE SEREJO

LINE KONDRUP ELKJAER

Minors and Claimants

SILAS KONDRUP ELKJAER

PHILIP MAR SEREJO

Defendants

DANIEL WALLACE HOWELL

GLORIA HOWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

MARTENSEN WRIGHT, LLP

112 J St Second Fl

Sacramento, CA 95814

MARTENSEN & WRIGHT

112 J Street Second Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

MARTENSEN WRIGHT PC

112 J Street Second Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorney

WINET PATRICK & WEAVER

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264-7703

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL & PROOF OF DEPOSIT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENTS BY MAIL ON 10/28/11 AS TO CATHERINE GAYER AND GLORIA HOWELL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111028-3452 $31.50; 111028-3452-VS Reference Number 023-0095616705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111028-3455 $0.66; 111028-3455-VS Reference Number 023-0095616705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • DECLARATION OF CATHERINE GAYER RE:OSC RE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED-REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY MAIL ON 09/19/11 AS TO CATHERINE GAYER/GLORIA HOWELL/DANIEL SEVER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110922-2369 $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2010
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JONATHAN SEREJO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PLTF ON 05/03/10 AS TO DEFT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • DECLARATION OF CCP SECTION 377.32 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY DANIEL WALLACE HOWELL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK & WEAVER.; Minutes; Receipt: 100329-0624 $355.00; 100329-0624-CK Reference Number 1701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DANIEL WALLACE HOWELL. PARTY SERVED ON 02/25/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100218-0584 $355.00; 100218-0584-CK Reference Number 103022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • ADA LETTER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.