This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 18:11:20 (UTC).

SO CAL EDISON-V-S&S DOUGLAS PIPELINE

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 SO CAL EDISON-V-S S DOUGLAS PIPELINE was filed as a Property - Other Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4478

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Defendant

LYLE PARKS, JR. CONSTRUCTION, INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

04/02/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LYLE PARKS, JR. C

10/27/2017: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LYLE PARKS, JR. C

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

10/27/2017: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

10/27/2017: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY S&S DOUGLAS PIPELINE, INC.; PARTY

09/08/2017: ANSWER FILED BY S&S DOUGLAS PIPELINE, INC.; PARTY

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/28/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

07/24/2017: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

07/24/2017: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

07/24/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

07/24/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

07/24/2017: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial; Original Type: Court Trial; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180403-0569; ConversionPayment; $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE CTN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY FOR FAX FILING 180403-0569-VS FAX/ 4.00 PAYMT 180403-0569-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0061404779

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $452.71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $910.42; Total Payments and Credits: $910.42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY FOR NEW FILING, FAX, COPIES, P&E 170727-0687-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.49 PAYMT 170727-0687-VS TSB/ 0.02 CVR/ 435.00 PAYMT 170727-0687-VS FAX/ 13.00 FCP/ 4.00 PAYMT 170727-0687-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0027329777

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less