This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:02:24 (UTC).

SNIEGOWSKI -V- FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 SNIEGOWSKI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRANKLIN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONALD SNIEGOWSKI

Defendant

JERMAINE FRANKLIN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING SIGNATURE FILED.

AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING SIGNATURE FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 03.14.17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 03.14.17); Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0157 $25.00; 170314-0157-CK Reference Number 1167736

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JERMAINE FRANKLIN; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JERMAINE FRANKLIN; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/19/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JERMAINE FRANKLIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JERMAINE FRANKLIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0194 $255.00; 170119-0194-CK Reference Number 1165621

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED WRIT RETURN AMENDING SIGNATURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 03.14.17); Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0157 $25.00; 170314-0157-CK Reference Number 1167736

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $21.50.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER SUE A DALTON 5124; BAILIFF: S LEACH; ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; HEIDI STEELE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF; DEFENDANT JERMAINE FRANKLIN PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RONALD SNIEGOWSKI; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY PARTIES PRESENT AND COUNSEL); WITNESS -- HEIDI STEELE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JERMAINE FRANKLIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: RONALD SNIEGOWSKI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JERMAINE FRANKLIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $300.00 AND DAMAGES $1,890.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,690.00; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/26/17.; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; ALL PERSONAL BELONGINGS LEFT BEHIND ARE DEEMED ABANDONED. NO FURTHER STAYS OR POST JUDGMENT; MOTIONS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JERMAINE FRANKLIN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JERMAINE FRANKLIN FOR ANSWER TO UD IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JERMAINE FRANKLIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170124-0103 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0194 $255.00; 170119-0194-CK Reference Number 1165621

    Read MoreRead Less