This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 03:43:38 (UTC).

SMITH -V- RAMIREZ ETAL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SMITH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1546

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON SMITH

Defendants

SARAH ASHLEE STROUD

JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF SHANNON SMITH GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SHANNON SMITH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,400.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $1,240.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,615.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SHANNON SMITH.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SHANNON SMITH.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FAST EVICTION-DROP)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FAST EVICTION-DROP); Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0678 $25.00; 170728-0678-CK Reference Number 1175372

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF SHANNON SMITH ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SHANNON SMITH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SARAH ASHLEE STROUD; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SARAH ASHLEE STROUD; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0191 $255.00; 170711-0191-CK Reference Number 1175238

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF SHANNON SMITH GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SHANNON SMITH; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ, SARAH ASHLEE STROUD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,400.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $1,240.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,615.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 08/31/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $575.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ANDASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR SHANNON SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SARAH ASHLEE STROUD; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF SHANNON SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSHUA LEE RAMIREZ FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0693 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.00.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0191 $255.00; 170711-0191-CK Reference Number 1175238

    Read MoreRead Less