This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/25/2018 at 02:51:37 (UTC).

SLAUGHTER -V- MIDDLETON

Case Summary

On 11/27/2012 SLAUGHTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIDDLETON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0448

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

JOHN SLAUGHTER

JULIANNE SLAUGHTER

Appellants and Defendants

SAMUEL MIDDLETON

CHRISTINE MIDDLETON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD M GHAN

55198 Twentynine Palms Highway Suite 1

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY CHRISTINE MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD REASON (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY CHRISTINE MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD REASON (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD REASON (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD REASON (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR CHRISTINE MIDDLETON FILED. (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR CHRISTINE MIDDLETON FILED. (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR SAMUEL MIDDLETON FILED. (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR SAMUEL MIDDLETON FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY CHRISTINE MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE REQUEST WAS NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY CHRISTINE MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE REQUEST WAS NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE REQUEST WAS NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE REQUEST WAS NOT FILED AT LEAST 10 DAYS BEFORE THE HEARING AND DID NOT INCLUDE GOOD (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130306-1004 $10.00; 130306-1004-MC Reference Number 025-0049866253

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON, CHRISTINE MIDDLETON.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY SAMUEL MIDDLETON, CHRISTINE MIDDLETON.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CHRISTINE MIDDLETON. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CHRISTINE MIDDLETON. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SAMUEL MIDDLETON. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SAMUEL MIDDLETON. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAMUEL MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAMUEL MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINE MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINE MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 121130-3644 $75.00; 121130-3644-EZ Reference Number LN76434SF814290W

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • CK 63109 SENT TO JOHN SLAUGHTER FOR $2771.76.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT CREDITORS REQUEST FOR FUNDS FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130402-1056 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 130403-0249 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • NOTICE WAS SENT TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR JOHN SLAUGHTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • $2,771.76 IN CASH DEPOSITED IN TRUST RECEIPT #: 20130403-0172

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • REQUEST TO PAY JUDGMENT TO COURT FILED BY JUDGMENT DEBTOR CHRISTINE MIDDLETON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • RETURN MAIL FORWARDED TO CORRECT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL TO PLAINTIFF RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JOHN SLAUGHTER PRESENT; DEFENDANT SAMUEL MIDDLETON, CHRISTINE MIDDLETON PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JULIANNE SLAUGHTER; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JOHN SLAUGHTER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; SAMUEL MIDDLETON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; CHRISTINE MIDDLETON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 11/27/2012 OF JOHN SLAUGHTER ORDERED ENTERED 01/14/13; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT JOHN SLAUGHTER HAVE &; RECOVER FROM SAMUEL MIDDLETON, CHRISTINE MIDDLETON:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,395.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,490.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO SAMUEL MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 121210-3534 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINE MIDDLETON. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOHN SLAUGHTER, JULIANNE SLAUGHTER FOR CERTIFIED MAIL ON DEFENDANTS; Minutes; Receipt: 121130-3758 $20.00; 121130-3758-EZ Reference Number LN76434SF814290W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 121130-3644 $75.00; 121130-3644-EZ Reference Number LN76434SF814290W

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.