This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 10:47:24 (UTC).

SJO -V- ZUBAID

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 SJO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZUBAID. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1279

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC

SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

JOEL ZUBAID

ZUBAID, JOEL

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE ENOCHS LAW GROUP APC

Attorney at The Enochs Law Group APC

7777 Alvarado Road Suite 624

La Mesa, CA 91942

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/16/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice Returning Documents

12/11/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Declaration Filed

12/09/2021: Declaration Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

08/16/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice Returning Documents

08/13/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/26/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

**CV - Portal Minute Order

07/14/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/14/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/15/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/14/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOEL ZUBAID FILED

09/29/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOEL ZUBAID FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON JOEL Z

08/05/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON JOEL Z

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

06/12/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

06/12/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

06/12/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

06/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

06/12/2020: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Submission of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Request for Clerk's Judgment and associated documents received on 08/13/2020 are being returned. 1. Non-military status declaration in form CIV-110 Item 8 is incomplete without data on Item 1c. 2. Item 1(e) on form CIV-110 is incomplete. 3. Breach of contract date is contradictory within the Declaration of Scott Oots; unable to verify interest calculation. 4. Requested costs include postage and overhead fees that are not permitted pursuant to CCP 1033.5 For above reasons, no clerk's default judgment is entered. If pursuing a default judgment, please resubmit with corrections and/or request a default judgment by Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: PLA DECL OF JEFFREY D. POINDEXTER RE STATUS OF ENTRY OF JMNT AFTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOSC re: Sanctions - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for Pltf's FTA/Status of Setting Default Prove-Up Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Request for Dismissal of DOES received on 08/13/21 is returned; Item 1a of Form CIV-110 is not complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Court Judgment - Per the Court, CIV-100 does not list Def's name in section 1)c. The attorneys' fees are in an excessive amount.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of minute order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Filing of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: - Filing of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SJO INVESTMENTS, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 200629-0356-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200629-0356-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3718610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant