This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 17:18:33 (UTC).

SJO Investments, LLC -v- Perry et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 SJO Investments, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Perry. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. and Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4980

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SJO Investments, LLC

Defendants

Wycliffe, Sean

Defendants Ficticiously Named As Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive

Wycliffe, Sean Nathaniel

Perry, Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enochs Law Group, APC

Attorney at Enochs Law Group, APC

Defendant Attorney

Leichnitz, Leonard Paul

 

Court Documents

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

03/23/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

03/04/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

03/02/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

03/02/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/02/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

02/23/2021: Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

02/16/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Notice Returning Documents

01/21/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

01/21/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Request to Enter Default Filed

01/21/2021: Request to Enter Default Filed

Declaration re:

01/19/2021: Declaration re:

Demurrer Filed

01/19/2021: Demurrer Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

01/11/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice Returning Documents

01/11/2021: Notice Returning Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/14/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

12/10/2020: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

12/10/2020: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

11/23/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; SJO Investments, LLC; Perry, Edward; Wycliffe, Sean; Defendants Ficticiously Named As Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-11224; One Legal; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: Notice of Ruling on Demurrer to complaint by Sean Wycliffe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: Copy of minute order mailed to counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Demurrer to complaint filed by Defendant Sean Wycliffe 1/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition to Motion Filed; Comment: to Demurrer to complaint by Sean Wycliffe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY SEAN WYCLIFFE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $565.00; Total Payments and Credits: $565.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $525.00 Check Paid For Ex Parte/1st Appearance on 11/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: OF JON ALAN ENOCHS ISO EX PARTE APPL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: OF SCOTT OOTS ISO EX PARTE APPL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application; Comment: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant