This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:12:54 (UTC).

SIQUN KUANG -N- LOUIS HUNG LIN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SIQUN KUANG -N- LOUIS HUNG LIN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0675

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIQUN KUANG

Respondent

LOUIS HUNG LIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEN WINNY YANG

200 S. Garfield Ave. Suite 103

Alhambra, CA 91801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/28/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF SIQUN KUANG FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF SIQUN KUANG ORDERED ENTERED 02/07/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON LOUIS HUNG LIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LOUIS HUNG LIN FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LOUIS HUNG LIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF SIQUN KUANG AS TO LOUIS HUNG LIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SIQUN KUANG FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PETITION/SUMMONS BY LOUIS HUNG LIN WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/27/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LOUIS HUNG LIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/21/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0705 $435.00; 161215-0705-CK Reference Number 18809

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.