This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 10:52:12 (UTC).

SIMANJUNTAK-V-PARRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/16/2010 SIMANJUNTAK-V-PARRA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0666

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANS SIMANJUNTAK

Defendants

LISA MICHELLE PARRA

VALENTIN SOLIS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN E. BOUZANE

634 Oak Court

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY VIA SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 101222-2984 $25.00; 101222-2984-CK Reference Number 166323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY WILLIAM WINDHAM FOR ATTORNEY JOHN BOUZANE FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT LISA MICHELLE PARRA, VALENTIN SOLIS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CAUSE SETTLED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: HANS SIMANJUNTAK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LISA MICHELLE PARRA, VALENTIN SOLIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,142.50 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $350.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,892.50; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: LISA MICHELLE PARRA, VALENTIN SOLIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 01/01/11.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); JUDGMENT SIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/16/2010 OF HANS SIMANJUNTAK AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/16/2010 OF HANS SIMANJUNTAK, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 11/16/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VALENTIN SOLIS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON VALENTIN SOLIS FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY VALENTIN SOLIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LISA MICHELLE PARRA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LISA MICHELLE PARRA FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LISA MICHELLE PARRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY LISA MICHELLE PARRA, VALENTIN SOLIS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 101116-2989 $255.00; 101116-2989-CK Reference Number 164360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.