This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:46:22 (UTC).

SIERRA LYNN HUNTER -V- TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 SIERRA LYNN HUNTER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0337

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIERRA LYNN HUNTER

Respondent

TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT VCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF SIERRA HUNTER FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF SIERRA HUNTER ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 06/20/17 BY SIERRA LYNN HUNTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SIERRA LYNN HUNTER FOR PRELIM/WVR FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF SIERRA HUNTER AS TO TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SIERRA LYNN HUNTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TONY CARLOS SALKELD JR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SIERRA LYNN HUNTER IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SIERRA LYNN HUNTER FOR 1ST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SIERRA LYNN HUNTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.