Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/28/2018 at 05:01:03 (UTC).

SHERWOOD -V- CATY JR

Case Summary

On 11/27/2013 SHERWOOD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CATY JR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3116

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC.

Defendant

ROBERT CATY JR

Assignee

KBR INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

OLIVEIRA, DUANE S

190 S. Orchard Avenue Ste A-200

Vacaville, CA 95688

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN ON WRIT FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. PARTIALLY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN ON WRIT FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. PARTIALLY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $398.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $76.14 (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $398.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $76.14 (IMAGED)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $213.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.38)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $213.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.38)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE )

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ); Minutes; Receipt: 140728-1258 $25.00; 140728-1258-CK Reference Number 8717

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $700.00) FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $700.00) FILED.

SUB OF ATTY FILED PER ASSIGNEE FILED.

SUB OF ATTY FILED PER ASSIGNEE FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $15.99)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $15.99)

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 11/27/2013 OF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. FILED ADDING KBR INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 11/27/2013 OF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. FILED ADDING KBR INC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DAN DETIENNE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: I WILLIS; APPEARANCES:; SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY IASPARRO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROBERT CATY JR; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; ROBERT CATY JR HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANTHONY IASPARRO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ROBERT CATY JR.; JUDGMENT FOR: SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT CATY JR; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,334.70 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,439.70; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 09:07; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS HRG BY MAIL ON 02/14/14 AS TO ROBERT CATY JR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS HRG BY MAIL ON 02/14/14 AS TO ROBERT CATY JR, FILED.

NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SENT.; Minutes; THE ABOVE MATTER IS SET FOR A HEARING ON 03/14/14 IN DEPT F2 @ 8:00AM IN FONTANA SUPERIOR COURT.; NOTICES PRINTED

ORDER RE:DECLARATION REQUESTING TO VACATE DISMISSAL FILED

ORDER RE:DECLARATION REQUESTING TO VACATE DISMISSAL FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT CATY JR.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO ROBERT CATY JR; THE ABOVE MATTER IS SET FOR A SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 03/14/14 @ 8:00AM IN DEPT F2 @ THE; FONTANA SUPERIOR COURT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT CATY JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/04/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT CATY JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/04/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN ON WRIT FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. PARTIALLY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RET FROM LA, PARTIALLY SATIS WITH COSTS OF 0.00 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,478.30 FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $398.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $76.14 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 160330-0395 $25.00; 160330-0395-CK Reference Number 11111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,364.36) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $213.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $51.38)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • MEMO OF COST/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PPRWRK RECEIVED IN FONTANA 1/28/14 AFTER HRG ON 1/24/14 CASE DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE:DECLARATION REQUESTING TO VACATE DISMISSAL FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC. SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT CATY JR.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO ROBERT CATY JR; THE ABOVE MATTER IS SET FOR A SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 03/14/14 @ 8:00AM IN DEPT F2 @ THE; FONTANA SUPERIOR COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • DEC AND ORDER REQUESTING VACATE DISMISSAL (FAX) RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DAN DETIENNE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHERWOOD MANAGEMENTCO. INC., ROBERT CATY JR; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT CATY JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/04/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $75.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 131127-2275 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliveira, Duane S