This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 08:09:16 (UTC).

SHEPHARD -V- BASTICLAS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 SHEPHARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BASTICLAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0335

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABDULLAH SHEPHARD

Defendants

VICTOR M BASTIDAS

NORMA BASTIDAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED RTS AS TO NORMA BASTIDAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/03/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • PARTY NORMA BASTIDAS UPDATED: S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • PARTY VICTOR M BASTIDAS UPDATED: LAST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/16/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO VICTOR M BASTIDAS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $20.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO NORMA BASTIDAS. PARTY SERVED ON 08/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $20.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) OF ABDULLAH SHEPHARD (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110722-1179 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110915-1050 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less