This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 14:07:19 (UTC).

SHEILA DE LA PENA -V- ROBERT JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 03/10/2011 SHEILA DE LA PENA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT JOHNSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2470

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIELA MARIE BARRAMEDADELAPENA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SLATER INC

JONATHAN RYAN STARK

ROBERT DALE JOHNSON

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JONATHAN RYAN STARK

ROBERT DALE JOHNSON

SLATER, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM

8730 Wilshire Blvd Ste 310

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Ave Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92614

GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY & JENNETT

1055 West Seventh Street Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY JONATHAN RYAN STARK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA ALANIZ; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL VIA TELECOM (KAITLIN JOHNSON).; REASON: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS ARE NOT COMPLETE YET.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/25/12 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT R12.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF CONT OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY SHIELA MARIE BARRAMEDADELAPENA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 07/12/2011 OF JONATHAN STARK FILED BY JONATHAN RYAN STARK, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JONATHAN RYAN STARK, ON 04/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2011 OF ROBERT JOHNSON FILED BY ROBERT DALE JOHNSON, SLATER, INC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ROBERT DALE JOHNSON, SLATER, INC, ON 04/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND VACATED READINESS CALENDAR FILED BY SHIELA MARIE BARRAMEDADELAPENA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BEN T KAYASHIMA, JUDGE; CLERK: ELAINE CARLOS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY OFFICE OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM (BY PHONE - CAITLIN JOHNSON) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF; SHIELA DE LA PENA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED ON 02/21/12.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 04/27/12 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT R12; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY SHIELA MARIE BARRAMEDADELAPENA.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2011
  • DECLARATION OF SHARONA ESLAMBOLY HAKIM RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ATTACHED. FORM #POS010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY ROBERT DALE JOHNSON, SLATER INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARSHALL & FRENCH.; Minutes; Receipt: 110526-3198 $790.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO SLATER INC. PARTY SERVED ON 04/26/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT DALE JOHNSON SERVED ON 04/28/11 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110310-1577 $395.00; 110310-1577-CK Reference Number 2457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.