This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 21:03:37 (UTC).

SHEIDA -V- CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 SHEIDA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAMPBELL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1037

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA

Defendant

CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( AT COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/09/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 06/09/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL SERVED ON 05/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL SERVED ON 05/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/17/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/17/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PURSUANT TO RULR OF COURT 3.1320(D) THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 06/08/17 HAS BEEN CHANGED.; THE HEARING IS RESET FOR 06/02/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1 ALL PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO; APPEAR.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF STAY PROCEEDINGS/NTC OF BANKRUPTCY FILING BY MAIL ON 07/11/17 AS TO ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BK#6:17-BK-15756-MJ FILED BY CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROOHOLLAH SHEIDA FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0398 $25.00; 170622-0398-CK Reference Number 6406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL FOR 1ST PAPER FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINA LASHAWN CAMPBELL IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0447 $255.00; 170511-0447-VS Reference Number 026-0039347451

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,850.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $61.66.--BEGINNING ON 05/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.