This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:09:37 (UTC).

SHAWHAN -V- WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SHAWHAN -V- WRIGHT was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9403

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMANDA SHAWHAN

Defendant

SHAWN WRIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY P JOHNSON

1970 Old Tustin Sve 2Nd Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BARRON & NEWBURGER, P.C.

1970 Old Tustin Avenue Second Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorneys

KLUTE & NEWTON

1030 Nevada Street Ste 104

Redlands, CA 92374

FARMER CASE & FEDER

402 W Broadway Suite 110

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY P JOHNSON FOR AMANDA SHAWHAN CHANGES ITS NAME TO BARRON & NEWBURGER,P.C. FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY P JOHNSON FOR AMANDA SHAWHAN CHANGES ITS NAME TO BARRON & NEWBURGER,P.C. FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0095 $435.00; 171004-0095-CK Reference Number 674

DEFENDANT SHAWN WRIGHTS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

DEFENDANT SHAWN WRIGHTS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL ... FILED.

STIPULATION RE: FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL ... FILED.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AMANDA SHAWHAN PRESENT; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY P. JOHNSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY M. WORKMAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT INSURANCE ADJUSTER GREGORY L. BLICK PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:33; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; 01:34; COURT IN RECESS.; 03:12; COURT RECONVENES WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES PRESENT; COURT REPORTER ROCHELLE KEOGH 6643; PARTIES ANNOUNCE SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED.; TERMS OF SETTLEMENT IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; PAYMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25,000.00 WILL BE MADE WITHIN 30 DAYS OF PLAINTIFFS SIGNATURE ON; RELEASE. ONCE PAYMENT HAS BEEN RECEIVED COUNSEL WILL FILE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.; LIENS TO BE SATISFIED BY THE PLAINTIFF; 1542 WAIVERS; EACH SIDE TO BEAR OWN COSTS.; COURT INQUIRES WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES AS TO THEIR UNDERSTANDING AND ACCEPTANCE OF THE TERMS; OF THE SETTLEMENT.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CUASE AS TO WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH; PREJUDICE.; SHOULD THERE BE NO APPEARANCE AT THE NEXT HEARING, COUNSEL STIPULATE THAT THE COURT MAY; DISMISS THIS MATTER WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE) SET FOR 10/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 03:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLUTE & NEWTON.

ANSWER FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLUTE & NEWTON.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY AMANDA SHAWHAN

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY AMANDA SHAWHAN

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED

ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED; Minutes; CASE REFERRED TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; MSC ORDER PER CRC 3.1380 AND LOCAL RULE 611, ALL TRIAL COUNSEL, PARTIES AND ADJUSTERS ARE ORDERED; TO APPEAR, (NO TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PERMITTED, INCLUDING ADJUSTER) AND NO LESS THAN 5 DAYS; PRIOR TO THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, MSC BRIEFS MUST BE FILED THAT INCLUDE ALL 6 ELEMENTS; ENUMERATED IN RULE 612 INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS.; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/02/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING); SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/07/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF AMANDA SHAWHAN PRESENT; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY P. JOHNSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY M. WORKMAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT INSURANCE ADJUSTER GREGORY L. BLICK PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:33; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER IN CHAMBERS OFF THE RECORD; 01:34; COURT IN RECESS.; 03:12; COURT RECONVENES WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES PRESENT; COURT REPORTER ROCHELLE KEOGH 6643; PARTIES ANNOUNCE SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED.; TERMS OF SETTLEMENT IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD.; PAYMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25,000.00 WILL BE MADE WITHIN 30 DAYS OF PLAINTIFFS SIGNATURE ON; RELEASE. ONCE PAYMENT HAS BEEN RECEIVED COUNSEL WILL FILE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE.; LIENS TO BE SATISFIED BY THE PLAINTIFF; 1542 WAIVERS; EACH SIDE TO BEAR OWN COSTS.; COURT INQUIRES WITH COUNSEL AND PARTIES AS TO THEIR UNDERSTANDING AND ACCEPTANCE OF THE TERMS; OF THE SETTLEMENT.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CUASE AS TO WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH; PREJUDICE.; SHOULD THERE BE NO APPEARANCE AT THE NEXT HEARING, COUNSEL STIPULATE THAT THE COURT MAY; DISMISS THIS MATTER WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE) SET FOR 10/04/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 03:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT SHAWN WRIGHTS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY AMANDA SHAWHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED; Minutes; CASE REFERRED TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; MSC ORDER PER CRC 3.1380 AND LOCAL RULE 611, ALL TRIAL COUNSEL, PARTIES AND ADJUSTERS ARE ORDERED; TO APPEAR, (NO TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE PERMITTED, INCLUDING ADJUSTER) AND NO LESS THAN 5 DAYS; PRIOR TO THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, MSC BRIEFS MUST BE FILED THAT INCLUDE ALL 6 ELEMENTS; ENUMERATED IN RULE 612 INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS.; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/02/19 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING); SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/03/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/07/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL ... FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DEFENDANT SHAWN WRIGHT FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SHAWN WRIGHT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171121-0613 $435.00; 171121-0613-CK Reference Number CK 6199

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SHAWN WRIGHT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLUTE & NEWTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0095 $435.00; 171004-0095-CK Reference Number 674

    Read MoreRead Less