This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:17:34 (UTC).

SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON -N- EUGENE ATKINSON

Case Summary

On 07/05/2012 SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON -N- EUGENE ATKINSON was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0021

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON

Respondent

EUGENE REED ATKINSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

03/08/2013

DocketFAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/05/2012 OF SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/05/2012 OF SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON ORDERED ENTERED 03/08/13; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2013

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/08/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EUGENE REED ATKINSON FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/05/2012 OF SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON AS TO EUGENE REED ATKINSON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketDECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON EUGENE REED ATKINSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketDECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON FOR PRELIMINARY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PET SUM BLNK RESP DEC SAD IE PROP BY EUGENE REED ATKINSON WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/19/13 FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PET SUM BLNK RESP DEC SAD IE PROP DEC FILED AS TO EUGENE REED ATKINSON. PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL/NAR. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE SUBMIT EVIDENCE OF ACTUAL DELIVERY TO THE RESPONDENT (SIGNED RETURN R.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2012

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SHARON MAYES-ATKINSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2012

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2012

DocketFAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2012

DocketFAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 120705-0710 $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2012

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less