This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 23:40:34 (UTC).

SHAFER VS NIAGARA BOTTLING

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 SHAFER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NIAGARA BOTTLING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6879

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCHESCA SHAFER

Defendant

NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESLIE GLYER LAW

23 Corporate Plaza Dr Ste 150

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON ON DEFS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ON DEFS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY FILED.

DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA HOOKS FILED

DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA HOOKS FILED

DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEC OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER FILED

DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEC OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER FILED

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17 FILED BY NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17 FILED BY NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEFS/MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/STAY PROCEEDINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCHESCA SHAFER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEFS/MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/STAY PROCEEDINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCHESCA SHAFER (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER/SUPP OF OPPO/DEF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER/SUPP OF OPPO/DEF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF LESLIE J GLYER FILED

DECLARATION OF LESLIE J GLYER FILED

OBJECTION TO EVID SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPP/ MTN TO COMPEL ARBIT FILED BY PLA

OBJECTION TO EVID SUBMITTED BY DEF IN SUPP/ MTN TO COMPEL ARBIT FILED BY PLA

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED SERVED ON 09/08/17 WITH FEES OF $32.89.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED SERVED ON 09/08/17 WITH FEES OF $32.89.

DECLARATION OF OF BRIAN FURLOW IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF OF BRIAN FURLOW IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF OF JUSTIN MAYNE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF OF JUSTIN MAYNE IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. HOOD IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. HOOD IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON ON DEFS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY OF JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS FILED BY DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE GLYER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY HEATHER B DILLON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY IS HEARD.; THE COURT GIVES ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS:; NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY IS GRANTED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF ARBITRATION SET FOR 10/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA HOOKS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING LLC EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEC OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17 FILED BY NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEFS/MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION/STAY PROCEEDINGS SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FRANCHESCA SHAFER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF FRANCHESCA SHAFER/SUPP OF OPPO/DEF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. HOOD IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND IMMEDIATE STAY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/11/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NIAGARA BOTTLING, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FRANCHESCA SHAFER FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170830-0751 $435.00; 170830-0751-CK Reference Number 119404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF FRANCHESCA SHAFER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less