This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 02:52:08 (UTC).

SHABBIR VS LUNA

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 SHABBIR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUNA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3868

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHULAM SHABBIR ABID

Defendants

JOSE TORRES

CARLOS ORELLANA

MARY F LUNA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM E WINDHAM

5206 Benito St #115

Montclair, CA 91763

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM WINDHAM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; PLAINTIFFS ORAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; S. ARZI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFFS #1 EXHIBIT(S) TRUSTEES DEED MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS #2 EXHIBIT(S) 3/90 DAY NOTICE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.; JUDGMENT FOR: GHULAM SHABBIR ABID; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; 09:02; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JOSE TORRES; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PRO/PER.

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY JOSE TORRES; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARY F LUNA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARY F LUNA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/07/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/07/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARY F LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/07/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARY F LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/07/17

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT MARY F LUNA; Disposition: DENIED

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT MARY F LUNA; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:24; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CASS WATTERS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARY F LUNA; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MARY F LUNA'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE IS HEARD.; DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR.; MARY F LUNA'S MOTION QUASH SERVICE IS DENIED.; DEFENDANT MARY LUNA HAS UNTIL 7/3/2017 TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; MOTION; JOSE TORRES'S MOTION DEMURRER IS HEARD.; DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR.; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED AS TO JOSE TORRES; DEFENDANT JOSE TORRES HAS UNTIL 7/3/2017 TO FILE AN ANSWER; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; OF RULING; 08:25; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1320(D) THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SET FOR 07/23/2017 HAS BEEN; CHANGED. THE HEARING IS RESET FOR 06/23/2017 AT 8:00AM IN DEPT. F6; ALL PARTIES NOTIFIED TO APPEAR; NOTICES PRINTED

DEMURRER FILED BY JOSE TORRES; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY JOSE TORRES; REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER(IMAGED)

ANSWER FILED BY CARLOS ORELLANA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY CARLOS ORELLANA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170607-0385 $255.00; 170607-0385-CK Reference Number 6014

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • SATISFACTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GHULAM SHABBIR ABID FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170719-0767 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170719-0764 $25.00; 170719-0764-CK Reference Number 6075

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM WINDHAM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; PLAINTIFFS ORAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IS DENIED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; S. ARZI IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFFS #1 EXHIBIT(S) TRUSTEES DEED MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS #2 EXHIBIT(S) 3/90 DAY NOTICE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.; JUDGMENT FOR: GHULAM SHABBIR ABID; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARY F LUNA, JOSE TORRES, CARLOS ORELLANA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; 09:02; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CARLOS ORELLANA ON 06/14/17 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSE TORRES. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY JOSE TORRES ON 06/14/17 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE SET FOR HEARING ON 06/23/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT MARY F LUNA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $100.00.--BEGINNING ON 06/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170607-0385 $255.00; 170607-0385-CK Reference Number 6014

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.