This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/15/2018 at 04:50:58 (UTC).

SEYMOUR LITTMAN -V- CONTINENTAL CLEANERS, ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2010 SEYMOUR LITTMAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CONTINENTAL CLEANERS, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2187

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEYMOUR LITTMAN

Defendants

CONTINENTAL CLEANERS

JESSIE SHARIF

 

Court Documents

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED

DECLARATION OF PLA, IN RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGE FILED.

DECLARATION OF PLA, IN RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGE FILED.

MOTION RE: (08/18/10) TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CLEANERS

MOTION RE: (08/18/10) TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CLEANERS; Minutes; Receipt: 100818-0844 $40.00; 100818-0844-CK Reference Number 6311

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY SEYMOUR LITTMAN.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY SEYMOUR LITTMAN.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN FILED; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR 10/04/10.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 10/04/10; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $530.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $220.00 AND DAMAGES $675.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,425.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JESSIE SHARIF, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO JESSIE SHARIF, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

CLERKS JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE CLERK CANNOT ENTER A JUDGMENT ON ONE DEFENDANT, MUST BE A COURT JUDGMENT.

CLERKS JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE CLERK CANNOT ENTER A JUDGMENT ON ONE DEFENDANT, MUST BE A COURT JUDGMENT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CONTINENTAL CLEANERS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CONTINENTAL CLEANERS FILED.

DECLARATION OF SEYMORE LITTMAN FILED

DECLARATION OF SEYMORE LITTMAN FILED

DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUD-100 FORM NEEDS TO BE COMPLETED/NEED SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS/SEPARATE PROOF OF SERVIC.

DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUD-100 FORM NEEDS TO BE COMPLETED/NEED SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS/SEPARATE PROOF OF SERVIC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JESSIE SHARIF. PARTY SERVED ON 03/03/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO JESSIE SHARIF. PARTY SERVED ON 03/03/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ONLY ONE DEFENDANT PER PROOF OF SERVICE,NOT MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS.

DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ONLY ONE DEFENDANT PER PROOF OF SERVICE,NOT MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS.

ANSWER FILED BY JESSIE SHARIF; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JESSIE SHARIF; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 100322-2869 $220.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100304-0643 $220.00

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 11/3/10 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; COURT REPORTER JANE FOLMER 2331; COURT ATTENDANT R UNGER; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SEYMOUR LITTMAN; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO APPEARANCE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: CASE SETTLED/NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 10/4/10 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • MOTION RE: (08/18/10) TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CLEANERS; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE BRIGUGLIO; COURT REPORTER HEATHER PFUTZENREUTER 10294; COURT ATTENDANT R UNGER; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SEYMOUR LITTMAN PRESENT; DEFENDANT JESSIE SHARIF PRESENT; MOTION; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; CONTINENTAL CLEANERS'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; THE COURT ISSUES TENTATIVE RULING; ARGUMENT HEARD BY PARTIES; COURT FINDS:; CONTINENTAL CLEANERS'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.; THE COURT ORDERS THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST CONTINENTAL CLEANERS VACATED AND SET ASIDE. THE; COURT ORDERS THE DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT JESSIE SHARIF VACATED. ANSWER FILED ON BEHALF OF; JESSIE SHARIF IS DEEMED FILED ON 3/22/10. ANSWER ON BEHALF OF CONTINENTAL CLEANERS IS TO BE; SERVED AND FILED ON OR BEFORE 10/6/10.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CLEANERS.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JESSIE SHARIF.; PARTIES AGREE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT OUTSIDE OF COURTROOM.; SUBSEQUENTLY PARTIES RETURN TO COURTROOM AND INFORM THE COURT A SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED; AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT JESSIE SHARIF HAS PROVIDED PLAINTIFF WITH A CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00; WHICH SETTLES THE CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY. EACH PARTY IS TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (AFTER SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 11/03/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R6.; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PLA, IN RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: SANCTIONS (NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ); Minutes; Receipt: 100818-4363 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: (08/18/10) TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CLEANERS; Minutes; Receipt: 100818-0844 $40.00; 100818-0844-CK Reference Number 6311

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CONTINENTAL CLEANERS. PARTY SERVED ON 03/03/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ONLY ONE DEFENDANT PER PROOF OF SERVICE,NOT MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY DEFT ON 03/22/10 AS TO PLA, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JESSIE SHARIF; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 100322-2869 $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 03/04/2010 OF SEYMOUR LITTMAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100304-0643 $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less