This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/21/2018 at 05:04:18 (UTC).

SERONKO V. CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE

Case Summary

On 05/05/2010 SERONKO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1234

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

MARTHA SERONKO

ERIC BUKOWSKI

Appellant and Defendant

CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN

Defendants

RICHARD DALE CUMMINS

CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000.00

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000.00

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130829-2591 $60.00

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN (IMAGED)

ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER FILED BY CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MARTHA SERONKO. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MARTHA SERONKO. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO FILED BY CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO FILED BY CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAN DETIENNE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: I WILLIS; APPEARANCES:; JUDGMENT CREDITOR MARTHA SERONKO, ERIC BUKOWSKI PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD DALE CUMMINS; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; COURT EXCEPTS PROOF OF SERVICE THAT WAS FILED 10/16/13.; BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED UPON RECEIPT OF SIGNED AFFIDAVIT AND PROCESSING FEE MADE PAYABLE TO THE APPROPRIATE SERVING AGENCY.; 09:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO, CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: REJECT NOTICE OF PROOF OF ORAP RECEIVED BACK FROM MARTHA SERONKO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER FOR EXAMINATION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME DOES NOT MATCH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • VACATE ORAP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/13 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO FILED BY CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 06/14/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO ORDERED ENTERED 06/10/10; JUDGMENT FOR: MARTHA SERONKO, ERIC BUKOWSKI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD DALE CUMMINS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,595.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; RONALD J GILBERT PRESIDING.; CLERK: VALERIE GUTIERREZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARTHA SERONKO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERIC BUKOWSKI; DEFENDANT CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; 10:09; WITNESS -- MARTHA SERONKO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DALE CUMMINS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/05/2010 OF MARTHA SERONKO AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT 000100 HAVE &; RECOVER FROM 000100.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,595.00; COURT ORDERS THE DEFENDANT TO RELEASE PLANS TO THE PLAINTIFF.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLTFS CLAIM FILED AS TO CUMMINS ARCHITECTURE & DESIGN. PARTY SERVED ON 05/25/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 0240091408015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 100505-5090 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO R1S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.