This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 15:57:02 (UTC).

SEGUNDO-V-GREAT AMERICAN

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 SEGUNDO-V-GREAT AMERICAN was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7015

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISTINA SEGUNDO

Defendant

GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SESSIONS & KIMBALL

23456 Madero, Suite 170

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL

4365 Executive Dr. Ste 950

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/26/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/26/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO DONALD ALVAREZ.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO DONALD ALVAREZ.

ANSWER FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL.

ANSWER FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/15/16 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/15/16 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180104-0113 $20.00; 180104-0113-CK Reference Number 3589991

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/26/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; SESSIONS & KIMBALL FOR CRISTINA SEGUNDO NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY CARY A KINKEAD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; 08:36; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT SETS TRIAL DATES AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 02/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; FOR TRIAL BEGINNING 02/20/18.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENSE.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL DATE. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE; DEEMED A WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/15/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GREAT AMERICAN CHICKEN CORP INC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CRISTINA SEGUNDO FOR FIRWST APPEARANCE FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161014-0041 $435.00; 161014-0041-CK Reference Number D3491476

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY CRISTINA SEGUNDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.