This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/04/2018 at 06:42:18 (UTC).

**SEE MF LUNA VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/07/2010 SEE MF LUNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2908

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

BRIAN RODRIGUEZ

ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ

LESLEY RODRIGUEZ

MARIA ELENA RODRIGUEZ

Defendants

JESUS ADOLFO MARTINEZ

HAYDEE JHANISS BUENO LUNA .

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AMEER A SHAH

9121 Haven Ave Suite 150

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

FARMER CASE HACK &FEDOR

402 West Broadway Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

WALTER S MARTINEZ

10722 Arrow Route Suite 610

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2015
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: MARY NUSS; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT L SKOPHAMMER; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY LAVONNA HAYASHI FOR AMEER SHAH FOR PLAINTIFF.; ATTORNEY DANIEL FALLON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JESUS ADOLFO MARTINEZ.; ATTORNEY WALTER S MARTINEZ PRESENT FOR HAYDEE LUNA.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; POLICY LIMITS HAVE BEEN OFFERED.; COUNSEL STATE THERE IS A RELATED CASE CIV1012871 THAT IS BEING HEARD IN R12.; THE COURT TRANSFERS THE MATTER TO R12; MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT R12; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/22/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R12.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVRS 1012871 MASTER FILE CIVRS 1012871; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • CMS SENT TO CAL PREP BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JESUS ADOLFO MARTINEZ FOR FAX FILING (6 PAGES); Minutes; Receipt: 110510-0141 $6.00; 110510-0141-VS Reference Number 028-0025446188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JESUS ADOLFO MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARIA ELENA RODRIGUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • NOTICE OF RESETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT.; Minutes; DUE TO THE UNAVAILABILITY OF THE COURT ON 05/06/11 THE COURT CONTINUES ALL HEARINGS SET; THIS DATE TO 05/19/11 AT 8:30AM IN R8.; VACATE CMC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; HEARINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/19/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8; NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY HAYDEE JHANISS BUENO LUNA . IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON HAYDEE JHANISS BUENO LUNA . FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY HAYDEE JHANISS BUENO LUNA .; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WALTER S MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/07/2010 OF MARIA RODRIGUEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR ASHLEY RODRIGUEZ IS MARCOS RODRIGUEZ -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID A WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR BRIAN RODRIGUEZ IS MARCOS RODRIGUEZ -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID A WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2010
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR LESLEY RODRIGUEZ IS MARCOS RODRIGUEZ -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID A WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101207-1944 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.