This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 23:44:30 (UTC).

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MGMT -V- CADENAS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 SEDGWICK CLAIMS MGMT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CADENAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0577

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

Defendants

SANDRA CADENAS

LUIS CASTELLANOS

CADENAS, SANDRA

CASTELLANOS, LUIS

Interested Party

THE MENTOR NETWORK

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIEGEL, MORENO, & STETTLER

1011 Camino Del Rio South Ste 600

San Diego, CA 92108

Siegel Moreno & Stettler

Attorney at Siegel Moreno & Stettler

Defendant Attorney

Stratman, Schwartz & Willams-Abrego

Attorney at Stratman, Schwartz & Willams-Abrego

 

Court Documents

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

05/12/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

Notice Filed

03/17/2021: Notice Filed

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL

09/22/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRI

09/17/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRI

STIPULATION RE- TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

09/17/2020: STIPULATION RE- TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SEDGWICK CLAI

06/04/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SEDGWICK CLAI

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

10/16/2019: NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAG

06/24/2019: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAG

ANSWER FILED BY SANDRA CADENAS, LUIS CASTELLANOS;

03/12/2019: ANSWER FILED BY SANDRA CADENAS, LUIS CASTELLANOS;

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

02/14/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

02/11/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 38

01/29/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 38

NOTICE IMAGED

01/09/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

01/09/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

01/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 190109-019

01/09/2019: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 190109-019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.; THE MENTOR NETWORK; CADENAS, SANDRA; CASTELLANOS, LUIS; CONV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketReturn to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketHearing Re:; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853 FILED BY SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20190109-0198; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,345.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 190109-0198-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190109-0198-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 8327

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant