This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 10:06:39 (UTC).

SEARS-V-MORRISON

Case Summary

On 08/31/2010 SEARS-V-MORRISON was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0666

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEARS, ROEBUCK ANDCO.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NAOMI URMAN

FRANK HEARD

CHARLES MORRISON

KEN MORRISON

PATRICIA W. THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST

PIMA PARTNERS INC

MORRISON & HEARD

KENLAR CONSTRUCTION, INC

AZTEC LLC

THE URMAN FAMILY TRUST

SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC LLC

SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC, LLC

PIMA PARTNERS, INC.

ELI URMAN

PATRICIA W. THOMPSON

KEN-LAR CONSTRUCTION, INC.

AZTEC, LLC

AZTEC, INC.

SEARS, ROESBUCK AND CO.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLITIS, NANGANO, & POLITIS

1055 West Seventh Street Suite 2288

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HOSP,GILBERT,BERGSTEN & HOUGH

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 401

Pasadena, CA 91101

BORTON PETRINI, LLP

1461 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92373

LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK J MCDONOUGH

Po Box 51457 3633 E Inland Empire Blvd #450

Ontario, CA 91764

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK &MARTHA

225 Broadway Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

LAW OFFICES OF HOSP,GILBERT,BERGSTEN & HOUG

301 N Lake Avenue Suite 410

Pasadena, CA 91101

HOSP GILBERT & PHILLIPS

301 N Lake Ave #410

Pasadena, CA 91101

BORTON PETRINI LLP

1461 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92373

MICHAEL A J NANGANO A LAW CORPORATION

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 2288

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; THOMAS BUTLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PATRICIA W. THOMPSON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; UPON REPRESENTATION OF ATTORNEY BUTLER, A; DISMISSAL WAS FILED WITH THE COURT 01-29-13.; COURT CONTINUES HEARING TO 02-01-13 FOR THE; COURT TO RECEIVE THE DISMISSAL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/01/13 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/13 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SEARS, ROEBUCK ANDCO. FILED BY SEARS, ROEBUCK ANDCO., WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF SEARS, ROEBUCK ANDCO., ON 01/29/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • ENTIRE ACTION AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2011 OF CHARLES MORRISON FILED BY CHARLES MORRISON, FRANK HEARD, PIMA PARTNERS INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CHARLES MORRISON, FRANK HEARD, PIMA PARTNERS INC, ON 01/28/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; MICHAEL NANGANO APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SEARS, ROEBUCK ANDCO..; SCOTT ZONDER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NAOMI URMAN.; DIRK SILVA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PATRICIA W. THOMPSON.; JESSICA GARD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; UPON REPRESENTATION OF COUNSEL, CASE HAS SETTLED.; COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS TO THE; COURT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/30/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC, LLC FILED BY SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC LLC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF SHAMROCK MILLCO-AZTEC LLC, ON 01/22/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF NAOMI URMAN FILED BY NAOMI URMAN, THE URMAN FAMILY TRUST, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NAOMI URMAN, THE URMAN FAMILY TRUST, ON 12/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2011
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARLES MORRISON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 110215-3944 $395.00; 110215-3944-CK Reference Number 363630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • NOTICE OF MOTION/MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARLES MORRISON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHARLES MORRISON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/18/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100831-4474 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • ADA MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.