This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:28:26 (UTC).

SEAN SMITH -N- JENNIFER DODD

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SEAN SMITH -N- JENNIFER DODD was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5771

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SEAN SMITH

Respondent

JENNIFER DODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: PETITIONERS ADDRESS MUST BE UPDATED IN OUR; SYSTEM. SPOUSAL SUPPORT MUST MATCH WHAT IS ON THE PETITION AND MUST ADDRESS BOTH PARTIES.; FL-180 AND FL-190 ARE BOTH BLANK. YOU MUST COMPLETE IT YOURSELF. THE COURT WILL NOT FILL; OUT YOUR FORMS. PETITIONER MISSING FINAL OR WAIVER OF FINAL FL-141, AND RESPONDENT IS; MISSING PRELIMINARY AND FINAL OR WAIVER OF FINAL FL-141.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SEAN SMITH FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNIFER DODD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF SEAN SMITH AS TO JENNIFER DODD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JENNIFER DODD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0379 $435.00; 170711-0379-MC Reference Number 030-0033913155

    Read MoreRead Less